Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFOUCHE v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02384
Date Filed2020-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJEANDRE FOUCHE
Case DescriptionJeandre Fouche, a South African resident, submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning his detention by ICE. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. ICE told Fouche it found only two pages responsive to his request. Fouche filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld the appeal. USCIS located 49 pages of records which were referred to ICE for determination. After hearing nothing further from either agency, Fouche filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-261COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7512313) filed by JEANDRE FOUCHE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Summons for Defendant ICE, # 14 Summons for Defendant USCIS, # 15 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGraw, Peter) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-282ERRATA by JEANDRE FOUCHE 1 Complaint,, filed by JEANDRE FOUCHE. (McGraw, Peter) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-283CIVIL COVER SHEET by JEANDRE FOUCHE 1 Complaint,, filed by JEANDRE FOUCHE. (McGraw, Peter) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-284REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by JEANDRE FOUCHE 1 Complaint,, filed by JEANDRE FOUCHE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(McGraw, Peter) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-28Case assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zmc) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-285SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-09-106ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Elizabeth Leiserson, Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by JEANDRE FOUCHE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGraw, Peter) Modified on 9/11/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-11NOTICE OF ERROR re 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; emailed to pmcgraw@trla.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. ENTERED IN ERROR; Please refile and pay the $100 filing fee. (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-237CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JEANDRE FOUCHE . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(McGraw, Peter) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar