Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWild Virginia et al v. United States Fish & Wildlife Service
DistrictWestern District of Virginia
CityCharlottesville
Case Number3:2020cv00051
Date Filed2020-08-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Norman K. Moon
PlaintiffWild Virginia a Virginia nonstock corporation
PlaintiffDavid Sligh
Case DescriptionWild Virginia submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning an updated technical analysis of potential project-related sedimentation. Wild Virginia also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). Wild Virginia filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Wild Virginia filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Segregability - Disclosure of all non-exempt records, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Fish & Wildlife Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-261COMPLAINT against United States Fish & Wildlife Service (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. Receipt number 0423-3471662), filed by Wild Virginia, David Sligh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-08-262Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wild Virginia (dg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-08-273Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Fish & Wildlife Service NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (dg)
2020-09-21IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020 . Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at NextGen Information . (mzc) (ADI)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar