Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAndrew Rudick v. The United States Department of the Treasury
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2020cv07634
Date Filed2020-08-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Virginia A. Phillips
PlaintiffAndrew Rudick
DefendantThe United States Department of the Treasury
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-181COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Andrew Rudick against Defendant The United States Department of the Treasury. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid.) (Attachments: # 1 CV71) (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-182CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andrew Rudick. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-183NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-264NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-26560 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 1 as to Defendant The United States Department of the Treasury. (jtil) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-08-267APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Andrew Rudick. (bm) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-08-286STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-09-108ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting 7 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (bm) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar