Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCHAEFER v. UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02315
Date Filed2020-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJASON PAUL SCHAEFER
DefendantUNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616103957) filed by JASON PAUL SCHAEFER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-19SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, US Attorney and Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-09-022ORDER: Advising pro se Plaintiff of his obligation to follow the FRCP, Local Rules and orders of the court, including rules regarding service of process. Failure to adhere to these rules or orders may result in sanctions, up to and including dismissal of this action. The Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this order to : JASON PAUL SCHAEFER, 80560065, SHERIDAN FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 6000, SHERIDAN, OR 97378 (See order for further details). Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/2/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-223Summons (1) Issued as to UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE. (ztd) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar