Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFargo v. United States Department of Homeland Security
DistrictDistrict of the Northern Mariana Islands
CityNMI
Case Number1:2020cv00023
Date Filed2020-08-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Ramona V. Manglona
PlaintiffMilan F. Fargo
DefendantFederal Emergency Management Agency
TERMINATED: 08/31/2020
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-191APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by Milan F. Fargo. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Complaint, # 2 Redacted Complaint, # 3 USDOJ Letter to Milan Fargo, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (DPB ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-194COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security with Jury Demand filed by Milan F. Fargo. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ADE) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-08-312AMENDED APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by Milan F. Fargo. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Cover Sheet, # 2 Email from Milan Fargo) (DPB) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-043ORDER to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Ramona V. Manglona on 09/04/2020. (ADE) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-08Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (ADE) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-235SUMMONS Returned Executed United States Department of Homeland Security served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (FPA) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar