Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBarron v. National Archives and Records Administration et al
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityBrownsville
Case Number1:2020cv00135
Date Filed2020-08-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rolando Olvera
PlaintiffRobert Jacob Barron
Case DescriptionRobert Barron submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records. After the agency failed to respond, Barron filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantNational Archives and Records Administration
DefendantDavid Ferriero Archivist
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-281COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25134053) filed by Robert Jacob Barron.(Goodwin, Jodilyn) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-282Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, William Barr, Attorney General of the United States; Ryan Patrick, U.S. Attorney Southern District of Texas, filed. (Attachments: # 1 summons, # 2 summons, # 3 summons)(Goodwin, Jodilyn) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-313AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Jacob Barron. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Robert Jacob Barron.(Goodwin, Jodilyn) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-314Summons Issued as to 1.) David Ferriero, 2.) National Archives and Records Administration, 3.) Ryan K Patrick, US Attorney, 4.) William Barr, US Attorney General. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-015ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya III(Signed by Magistrate Judge Ignacio Torteya, III) Parties notified.(EdnitaPonce, 1) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-176NOTICE of Dismissal as to All Defendants by Robert Jacob Barron, filed. (Goodwin, Jodilyn) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar