Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHarold Pick v. Motorola Solutions, Inc. et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2020cv08011
Date Filed2020-09-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John W. Holcomb
PlaintiffHarold Pick
Case DescriptionHarold Pick, who was investigated by the FBI and prosecuted by the U.S. Attorney's Office in a case involving Motorola, submitted FOIA requests to the FBI and the Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys for records concerning their investigation and prosecution of him. Both agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. EOUSA denied the request, citing Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The FBI told Pick that it found no records on him. Pick filed administrative appeals of both decisions. The Office of Information Policy remanded his request to EOUSA for processing but did not address the FBI appeal. Pick then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantMotorola Solutions, Inc. a Delaware Corporation
DefendantExecutive Office for United States Attorneys
DefendantUnited States Attorneys Office for the Northern District of Illinois
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-011COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27888707 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N) (Attorney Levi Lesches added to party Harold Pick(pty:pla))(Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-012CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-013NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick, (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-014Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Plaintiff Harold Pick. (Lesches, Levi) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-035NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-036NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-03721 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendants Executive Office for United States Attorneys, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Motorola Solutions, Inc., United States Attorneys Office for the Northern District of Illinois. (jtil) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-038STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge R. Gary Klausner. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the Court as well. See document for details. (smo) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-089ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge John F. Walter, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:04-cv-02655 JFW(Ex) (rn) Modified on 9/9/2020 (sr). [Judgment entered by Judge Collins after jury trial in 2005. This Court handled renewal of judgment on limited issue of standing (doc no. 402) and (doc no 433) in 2016 and had no involvement in underlying claims or trial resulting in judgment. No duplication of labor if heard by a different Judge. (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-10-0210ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 20-155) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge John W. Holcomb, this case is transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-08011-JWH-PVCx. (aco) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-0511This action has been reassigned to the Honorable John W. Holcomb, United States District Judge. Judge Holcomb is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Holcomb's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-1712STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 10/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar