Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAPPY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02448
Date Filed2020-09-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCHRISTOPHER L. CAPPY
Case DescriptionChristopher Cappy submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Veterans Affairs for records concerning himself needed for his administrative appeal of VA benefits. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency provided some records. Cappy filed an administrative appeal of the agency's partial denial. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Cappy filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-011COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7537577) filed by CHRISTOPHER L. CAPPY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons (x 3))(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-02Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zsb) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-022SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-023STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/02/2020. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-234NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar