Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02457
Date Filed2020-09-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning a 2009 incident in which a Secret Service agent allegedly tried to strike then Vice President Joe Biden during a photo opportunity. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request because any responsive 2009 records would have been destroyed. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7541336) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Dep't of Homeland Security)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-02Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-194RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/16/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2020)
2020-09-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/14/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2020)
2020-09-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/14/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar