Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleIMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC. v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02472
Date Filed2020-09-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffIMMIGRANT INVESTORS ASSOCIATION, INC.
doing business as INVEST IN THE USA ("IIUSA")
Case DescriptionImmigrant Investors Association submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the development and implementation of guidance relating to immigrant investors (EB-5) in connection with the June 2017 release of the USCIS Policy Manual. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Immigrant Investors Association filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ("DHS")
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ("USCIS")
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-031COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7549140) # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Grau, Aaron) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-04Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmd) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-042SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-04SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-083STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 8, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-10-154ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar