Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBuff v. United States of America et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv07182
Date Filed2020-09-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen McMahon
PlaintiffCarolyn Buff
Case DescriptionCarolyn Buff, a U.S. citizen living abroad since 1994, requested her tax files through her attorney. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it was processing her request. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Ball filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States of America
DefendantUS Treasury Department
DefendantInternal Revenue Service (IRS)
DefendantCeleste Neal IRS Disclosure Manager
DefendantEric Gadsden IRS Disclosure Specialist
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [3]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-031COMPLAINT against Eric Gadsden, Internal Revenue Service (IRS), Celeste Neal, US Treasury Department, United States of America. Document filed by Carolyn Buff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit).(rdz) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-03Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-032SUMMONS. Document filed by Carolyn Buff. (rdz) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-17NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-183ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEES OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the relevant fees or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Fees due by 10/19/2020. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 10/19/2020. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on September 18, 2020) (Attachments: # 1 IFP application) (jjg) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-18Mailed a copy of 3 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, and an IFP Application, to Carolyn Buff at c/o Steven Kraft, Bahnhofplatz 9, 8001 Zurich, Switzerland. (kh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-214PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Carolyn Buff consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Carolyn Buff.(sc) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar