Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02495
Date Filed2020-09-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor for records concerning the impact of COVID-19 on the agency. Public Citizen requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and assigned it to the Occupational Safety and Health Administration for processing. The agency asked Public Citizen to narrow the scope of its request. Public Citizen did so, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Citizen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7560681) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-08Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/14/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/14/2020. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/14/2020. (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 9/14/2020 (Pulver, Adam) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-177STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/17/20. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-10-148NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew I. Warden on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR (Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-149ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF LABOR.(Warden, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-15MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff brings this action pursuant to the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552. The parties are directed to meet and confer and propose a joint scheduling order for further proceedings in this case by no later than November 16, 2020. The parties' joint proposed scheduling order shall address the following: (1) The status of plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) The anticipated number of documents responsive to plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) The anticipated date(s), if any, for release of documents responsive to plaintiff's FOIA request; (4) Whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case; (5) Whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case; (6) Whether this case would benefit from referral to a magistrate judge or the District Court Mediation Program for purposes of settlement; and (7) A proposed briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if applicable. If the parties are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, the joint proposed scheduling order shall include each party's individual recommendations. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/15/2020. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2020 (mac) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar