Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleREADY AMERICA, INC. v. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02515
Date Filed2020-09-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffREADY AMERICA, INC.
Case DescriptionReady America, Inc. submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Emergency Management Agency for records provided by Composite Analysis Group relating to the certification of compliance with Title 21 in connection with contracts awarded for Indefinite Delivery Indefinite Quantity. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Ready America filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-081COMPLAINT against FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7564832) filed by READY AMERICA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons FEMA, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Sandweg, John) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-082LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by READY AMERICA, INC. (Sandweg, John) Modified event title on 9/9/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-09Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-10-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/16/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/22/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY served on 9/23/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Declaration of Service - U.S. Attorney General, FEMA, # 2 Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service - U.S. Attorney for DC)(Sandweg, John) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-165ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT AGENCY.(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar