Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02531
Date Filed2020-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Government Accountability Project submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture for records concerning all non-compliance records for food safety from establishment M1620. GAP also requested a fee waiver. GAP later submitted a request for expedited processing. The Food Safety and Inspection Service denied GAP's request for expedited processing. GAP filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expedited processing. The agency denied GAP's appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, GAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DefendantFOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-101COMPLAINT against FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7574332) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-K, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-102NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-103NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-10Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-104SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-115STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/11/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-10-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FOOD SAFETY AND INSPECTION SERVICE served on 9/21/2020 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/22/20. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/22/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar