Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePARKER v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02534
Date Filed2020-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffLONNIE JOSEPH PARKER
Case DescriptionLonnie Parker submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning himself since 1982. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. Parker contacted the FBI several times but after the agency failed to respond he filed an administrative appeal. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Parker filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-101COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7576266) filed by LONNIE JOSEPH PARKER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-11Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-143STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 14, 2020. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-234NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-10-155ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar