Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleD'SPAIN v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02536
Date Filed2020-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffLINDA L. D'SPAIN
Case DescriptionLinda D'Spain, an expert in Medicare coding serving as an expert witness, submitted a FOIA request to Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning charges or payments for various Medicare codes. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, D'Spain filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7576550) filed by LINDA L. D'SPAIN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Davenport, James) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-102NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LINDA L. D'SPAIN. Case related to Case No. 15-cv-392. (Davenport, James) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-11Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-113SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 9/17/2020 (Davenport, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/18/2020. (Davenport, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/18/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/18/2020. (Davenport, James) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-217Case randomly reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly as the case is not related. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-308ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/30/2020. (DM) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar