Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBINNS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02547
Date Filed2020-09-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffJOHN ERIN BINNS
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-10Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/10/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-101COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by JOHN ERIN BINNS.(zsb) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-102MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHN ERIN BINNS (zsb) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-21MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's motion 2 to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall randomly assign this case to a District Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/21/20.(psu1) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-213MOTION for CM/ECF Password by JOHN ERIN BINNS (zsb) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-24Case Reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmd) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-10-014STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 1, 2020. (lccjn3) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-05MINUTE ORDER. After review of 3 Plaintiff's Motion for a CM/ECF Password, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 10/5/20.(psu1) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-225SUMMONS (4) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. (zsb) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-296AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by JOHN ERIN BINNS.(BINNS, JOHN) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-11-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/5/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/5/2020. (eg) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-258RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 11/23/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/24/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/24/2020.) (eg) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-239ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2021-01-04MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this Freedom of Information Act case are an 6 Amended Complaint and an 9 Answer. According to Local Civil Rule 16.3, the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) are inapplicable. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall confer and file a Joint Status Report by January 25, 2021 . The Joint Status Report shall address: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); (5) the possibility of prioritizing documents responsive to Plaintiff's requests and any discussions regarding whether Plaintiff's requests can be narrowed; and (6) whether the Parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 4, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/25/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-2510Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-01-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties file an additional Joint Status Report by March 24, 2021 . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 27, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-01-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/24/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 01/27/2021)
2021-03-2411Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-04-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 48 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Parties submit another Joint Status Report by May 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 12, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-05-1012Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 05/10/2021)
2021-05-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the Parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the Parties are hereby ORDERED to file another Joint Status Report by August 9, 2021 , and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on May 13, 2021. (lccjn3) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-05-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2021. (zcal) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-05-1913Consent MOTION to Bifurcate Proceedings or, in the Alternative, for 44 Months to Complete Review by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael G. Seidel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar