Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02553
Date Filed2020-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffCITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
Case DescriptionCitizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning discussion of plans sending federal officers to Portland, Chicago, and other cities experiencing racial justice protests. CREW also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, CREW filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-111COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7582481) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Civil Cover Sheet, # 24 Summons re DOJ, # 25 Summons re DHS, # 26 Summons re USAO, # 27 Summons re USAG)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-113NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica A. Lutkenhaus on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Lutkenhaus, Jessica) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-114MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kelsey M. Quigley, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7582769. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kelsey M. Quigley, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-145NOTICE of Appearance by Nikhel Sus on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Sus, Nikhel) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-146SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-15MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kelsey M. Quigley is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/15/2020. (lctjk3) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-177NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey M. Quigley on behalf of CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Quigley, Kelsey) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-178CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON re 7 Notice of Appearance . (Quigley, Kelsey) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-10-099RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/21/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/22/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Summons Executed re USDHS)(Holtzblatt, Ari) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-0910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/22/2020. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-0911RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/9/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/8/2020. (Holtzblatt, Ari) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar