Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. UNITED STATES ARMY CENTRAL
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02554
Date Filed2020-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Army Central for records concerning investigation and casualty reports pertaining to the deaths of two identified service members in Iraq. The law firm then submitted an additional six FOIA requests casualty reports on six other service members or civilians. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Willkie Farr & Gallagher filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ARMY CENTRAL
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-111COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ARMY CENTRAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7582775) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons ACIM, # 3 Summons US AG, # 4 Summons Clerk, # 5 Ex.1 to ACIM-PRF Complaint, # 6 Ex. 2 to ACIM-PRF Complaint, # 7 Ex. 3 to ACIM-PRF Complaint, # 8 Ex. 4 to ACIM-PRF Complaint, # 9 Ex. 5 to ACIM-PRF Complaint)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ARMY CENTRAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-10-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 EX. Proof of Service ACIM-US ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES ARMY CENTRAL served on 9/22/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service ACIM)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar