Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. NAVAL SURFACE WARFARE CENTER INDIAN HEAD EOD TECHNOLOGY DIVISION COMMAND EVALUATION OFFICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02556
Date Filed2020-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted ten FOIA requests to the Naval Surface Warfare Center for records concerning reports of explosives used in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Willkie Farr & Gallagher filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNAVAL SURFACE WARFARE CENTER INDIAN HEAD EOD TECHNOLOGY DIVISION COMMAND EVALUATION OFFICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-111COMPLAINT against NAVAL SURFACE WARFARE CENTER INDIAN HEAD EOD TECHNOLOGY DIVISION COMMAND EVALUATION OFFICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7582849) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons CEXC, # 3 Summons US AG, # 4 Summons Clerk, # 5 Ex. 1 to CEXC Complaint (Redacted), # 6 Ex. 2 to CEXC Complaint, # 7 Ex. 3 to CEXC Complaint, # 8 Ex. 4 to CEXC Complaint, # 9 Ex. 5 to CEXC Complaint (Redacted))(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NAVAL SURFACE WARFARE CENTER INDIAN HEAD EOD TECHNOLOGY DIVISION COMMAND EVALUATION OFFICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-154GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/15/2020. (jag) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-10-155NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of NAVAL SURFACE WARFARE CENTER INDIAN HEAD EOD TECHNOLOGY DIVISION COMMAND EVALUATION OFFICE (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-156NOTICE re Intent File Answer by NAVAL SURFACE WARFARE CENTER INDIAN HEAD EOD TECHNOLOGY DIVISION COMMAND EVALUATION OFFICE (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-167RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service CEXC-US ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-168RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NAVAL SURFACE WARFARE CENTER INDIAN HEAD EOD TECHNOLOGY DIVISION COMMAND EVALUATION OFFICE served on 9/18/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service CEXC)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-169RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/21/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/21/2020. (See Docket Entry 7 to view document)(zjf) (Entered: 10/18/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar