Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02557
Date Filed2020-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted eight FOIA requests to the Defense Health Agency for records concerning AR-15-6 Investigation Report and Casualty Reports relating to specific attacks in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Willkie Farr & Gallagher filed suit.
Complaint issues: Fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-111COMPLAINT against DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7582902) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons DHA, # 3 Summons US AG, # 4 Summons Clerk, # 5 Ex. 1 to DHA Complaint, # 6 Ex. 2 to DHA Complaint, # 7 Ex. 3 to DHA Complaint, # 8 Ex. 4 to DHA Complaint)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-234NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-10-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service DHA-US ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE HEALTH AGENCY served on 9/21/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service DHA)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar