Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION-RECORD/INFORMATION DISSEMINATION SECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02558
Date Filed2020-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted seven FOIA requests to the FBI for records concerning specified attacks in Iraq. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Willkie Farr & Gallagher filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION-RECORD/INFORMATION DISSEMINATION SECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-111COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION-RECORD/INFORMATION DISSEMINATION SECTION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7582936) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons FBI, # 3 Summons US AG, # 4 Summons Clerk, # 5 Ex. 1 to FBI Complaint, # 6 Ex. 2 to FBI Complaint, # 7 Ex. 3 to FBI Complaint, # 8 Ex. 4 to FBI Complaint)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION-RECORD/INFORMATION DISSEMINATION SECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-10-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service FBI-US ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION-RECORD/INFORMATION DISSEMINATION SECTION served on 9/18/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service FBI)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar