Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02559
Date Filed2020-09-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffWILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Willkie Farr & Gallagher submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the death of a State Department employee who was killed in Iraq and whose family is being represented by the law firm. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Willkie Farr & Gallagher filed suit
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE Office of the Legal Advisor
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE-OFFICE OF THE LEGAL ADVISOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-111COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE-OFFICE OF THE LEGAL ADVISOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7583062) filed by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US DEPT OF STATE/OFC OF LEGAL ADVISOR, # 3 Summons US AG, # 4 Summons CLERK, # 5 Ex. 1 to State Dept. Complaint, # 6 Ex. 2 to State Dept. Complaint, # 7 Ex. 3 to State Dept. Complaint)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILLKIE FARR & GALLAGHER LLP (Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-14Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-254NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-10-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service STATE DEPT LEGAL ADVISOR-US ATTORNEY GENERAL)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-166RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 9/21/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Ex. Proof of Service STATE DEPT LEGAL ADVISOR)(Gottlieb, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar