Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCABEZAS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02484
Date Filed2020-09-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffANDREW F. CABEZAS
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantOFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-241COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616104062) filed by ANDREW F. CABEZAS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) Modified on 9/8/2020 (zrdj). (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-08-24SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-092Case directly reassigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols as related. Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-10-083NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of All Defendants (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-094RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 9/28/2020; OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY served on 9/24/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/29/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/29/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/29/2020.) (eg) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar