Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWEISE v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02572
Date Filed2020-09-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffOMAR WEISE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-08Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 9/15/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-081COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by OMAR WEISE.(adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by OMAR WEISE (adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-233PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/23/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-10-274PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by OMAR WEISE (adh, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-245ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $17.50 from Prison Account of OMAR WEISE and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/24/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-24Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar