Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMOHARAM v. U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02569
Date Filed2020-09-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffFAHMI AHMED MOHARAM
Case DescriptionFahmi Ahmed Moharam, who was raised in Yemen but immigrated to the U.S. and received derivative U.S. citizenship, submitted FOIA requests to the FBI and the State Department for records concerning why he had been placed on the no fly list. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The FBI told Moharam that it found no records. Moharam filed an administrative appeal of that finding. The FBI upheld the no records decision and further told Moharam that to the extent he was on the No-Fly list, such records would be withheld under Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Moharam heard nothing further from the State Department. He then filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Exemption 7(E) - Investigative methods or techniques, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-141COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7587945) filed by FAHMI AHMED MOHARAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons to FBI, # 9 Summons to Dept. of State, # 10 Summons to US Attorney General, # 11 Summons to DC US Attorney)(Litt, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-142REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Federal Bureau of Investigation re 1 Complaint,, filed by FAHMI AHMED MOHARAM. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by FAHMI AHMED MOHARAM. (Attachments: # 1 Summons State Department, # 2 Summons US Attorney General, # 3 Summons DC US Attorney)(Litt, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-153ERRATA by FAHMI AHMED MOHARAM. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Complaint Caption)(Litt, Robert) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-15Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-154STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/15/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-175SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-17SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (zmc) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-176REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Department of Justice filed by FAHMI AHMED MOHARAM.(Litt, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-187SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (eg) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-10-198NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar