Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02580
Date Filed2020-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Postal Service for records concerning appointment calendars for Louis DeJoy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told American Oversight that it had no responsive records because DeJoy's appointment calendars were personal records not subject to FOIA. American Oversight filed an administrative appeal. The agency acknowledged receiving the appeal. After hearing nothing from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [26]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-151COMPLAINT against U.S. POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7590851) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-15Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-214MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration and Exhibits, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/25/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/25/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/21/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE served on 9/21/2020 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-306NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Dodge on behalf of All Defendants (Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-307Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-30MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including October 25, 2020 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/30/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/25/2020. (tj) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/25/2020. (tj) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-238Joint MOTION to Hold in Abeyance by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-23MINUTE ORDER: granting 8 Joint Motion to Hold Deadline in Abeyance. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint and to file an opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is held in abeyance, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before November 20, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/23/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/20/2020 (tj) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-11-209Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-2010MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before December 18, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/20/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2020. (zgdf) (Entered: 11/22/2020)
2020-12-1811Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern summary judgment briefing: Defendant's Answer and Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before January 18, 2021, Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition shall be filed on or before February 15, 2021, Defendant's Opposition and Reply shall be filed on or before March 15, 2021, and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before April 5, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/18/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/18/2021, Cross Motions due by 2/15/2021. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/15/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/5/2021. Summary Judgment motions due by 1/18/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/15/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2021. (tj) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2020-12-31MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties representations in their status reports and this Court's adoption of a new summary judgment briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/31/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2021-01-1212Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule for Summary Briefing by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-12MINUTE ORDER: granting 12 Joint Motion to Modify Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing. It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern summary judgment briefing: Defendant's Answer and Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed on or before January 19, 2021, Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition shall be filed on or before February 16, 2021, Defendant's Opposition and Reply shall be filed on or before March 16, 2021, and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before April 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/12/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/19/2021, Cross Motions due by 2/16/2021. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/16/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/6/2021. Summary Judgment motions due by 1/19/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/16/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/16/2021. (tj) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-1913ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE.(Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-1914Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration of Janine Castorina, # 3 Declaration of Kristin Seaver, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-2615Consent MOTION to Modify Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-26MINUTE ORDER: granting 15 Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Modify the Schedule for Summary Judgment briefing. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before February 26, 2021, Defendant's opposition and reply shall be filed on or before March 26, 2021, and Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before April 16, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/26/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 2/26/2021. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/26/2021. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/16/2021. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/26/2021. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/26/2021. (tj) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-02-2416NOTICE of Appearance by Christine H. Monahan on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-2417NOTICE of Appearance by Mehreen A Rasheed on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-2618Memorandum in opposition to re 14 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-02-2619Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-1820Consent MOTION to Modify the Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-18MINUTE ORDER: granting 20 Defendant's Consent Motion to Modify the Schedule for Summary Judgment Briefing. It is hereby ORDERED that the deadlines shall be modified as follows: Defendant's Opposition and Reply shall be filed on or before April 2, 2021, and Plaintiff's Reply shall be filed on or before April 23, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/18/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/2/2021. Responses due by 4/2/2021 Replies due by 4/23/2021. (tj) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-04-0221Memorandum in opposition to re 19 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-0222REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-2323REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 04/23/2021)
2021-06-0224NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. Attorney Christine H. Monahan terminated. (Monahan, Christine) (Entered: 06/02/2021)
2021-09-2325ORDER denying 14 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 19 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/23/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-2326MEMORANDUM OPINION: denying 14 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and granting in part and denying in part 19 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/23/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar