Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWASHINGTON BLADE et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02591
Date Filed2020-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffWASHINGTON BLADE
PlaintiffCHRIS JOHNSON
Case DescriptionChris Johnson, a reporter for the Washington Blade, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Labor's Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs for records concerning emails from the director or deputy director containing the word "religion" or "religious" from January 2017 to August 2019. Johnson also requested expedited processing and inclusion in the news media fee category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted Johnson news media fee status. The agency told Johnson it would take some time to process his request. Johnson filed an administrative appeal of the agency's failure to respond on time. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Johnson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-151COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7593311) filed by WASHINGTON BLADE, CHRIS JOHNSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WASHINGTON BLADE (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-15Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-164STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/16/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-235RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/21/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/21/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/21/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR served on 9/21/2020 (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-10-216ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-22MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before November 10, 2020, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear telephonically for an Initial Scheduling Conference on November 17, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. The parties can obtain a teleconference number and access code from the deputy clerk prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/22/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-237NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of CHRIS JOHNSON, WASHINGTON BLADE (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-10-238NOTICE of Appearance by Gunita Singh on behalf of CHRIS JOHNSON, WASHINGTON BLADE (Singh, Gunita) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-11-109Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2020-11-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Parties' status report, Dkt. 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference set to take place on November 17, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED. It is further ORDERED that Parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/11/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/11/2020)
2020-12-1110STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/11/2020)
2021-01-1111Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
2021-01-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/11/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar