Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBUZZFEED INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02593
Date Filed2020-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionBuzzFeed submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justices' Criminal Division for records concerning filings by Archer Daniels Midland as part of a non-prosecution agreement signed in December 2013. The agency acknowledged the request. The agency told BuzzFeed that the request was being placed in the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, BuzzFeed filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7593756) filed by BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-152NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-153LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-16Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-174SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-185GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/18/2020. (jag) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-10-086NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/28/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/28/20. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-129RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/28/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-2810ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-11-0411Amended ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-04MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 5 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 11/18/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/4/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 12/18/2020, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/20/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-12-1813Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED INC.. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-2014NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Thomas Duffey on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Benton Peterson (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2020)
2020-12-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 1/20/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/21/2020. (jag) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2021-01-2015Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 3/22/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/21/2021. (jag) (Entered: 01/21/2021)
2021-03-2216Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-24MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before 5/21/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/24/2021. (jag) Modified on 3/25/2021, to make a correction. (zgdf). (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-05-2117Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 05/21/2021)
2021-05-21MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 7/21/2021, the parties shall file further joint status report, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/21/2021. (jag) (Entered: 05/21/2021)
2021-06-22Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson has been elevated to serve on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit. She is therefore no longer assigned to this case, and this matter has been reassigned to the Calendar Committee, which will oversee it until it is assigned to another district judge. Any questions should be directed to Judge Jackson's former deputy clerk, Gwendolyn Franklin, at 202-354-3145 or gwen_franklin@dcd.uscourts.gov. (rj) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-07-2118Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2021)
2021-07-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by September 21, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 23, 2021. (lcbah4) (Entered: 07/23/2021)
2021-07-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/21/2021. (zgdf) (Entered: 07/23/2021)
2021-09-2119Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duffey, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar