Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVargas v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv05464
Date Filed2020-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Thomas M. Durkin
PlaintiffErazo Vargas
Case DescriptionErazo Vargas submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement provided five responsive records. Vargas filed an administrative appeal of that decision. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services told Vargas that his request was being put on the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Vargas filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-151COMPLAINT filed by Jairo Erazo Vargas; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17438489. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-152ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jairo Erazo Vargas by Christopher Paul Elmore (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-15CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-153MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A joint status report is to be filed by 11/24/2020. Instructions may be found on Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-17SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (jg, ) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-18SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (jg, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-10-054SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erazo Vargas as to All Defendants on 9/18/2020, answers due 11/17/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/6/2020) (pj, ). (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-145SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erazo Vargas as to All Defendants served on 9/29/2020, answers due 10/29/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons and Corrected Return of Service to ICE - 20-cv-5464, # 2 Exhibit Summons and Corrected Return of Service to USCIS - 20-cv-5464, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Exhibit Certified mail receipts expenses for serving summons - 20-5464)(Elmore, Christopher) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 10/15/2020) (pj, ). (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-226DESIGNATION of Susan Willoughby Anderson as U.S. Attorney for Defendants U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-227MOTION by Defendants U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time to file answer (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-228NOTICE of Motion by Susan Willoughby Anderson for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 7 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/28/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-229MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for extension of time to answer 7 is granted. Defendants are to respond to the complaint by 11/30/2020. The 11/24/2020 status report deadline is vacated. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-11-2410MOTION by Defendants U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) (Anderson, Susan) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-2511MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Unopposed motion for extension of time to answer 10 is granted. Defendants are to file their response to the complaint by 12/18/2020. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar