Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleVAZQUEZ CARRILLO v. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv05468
Date Filed2020-09-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Thomas M. Durkin
PlaintiffBlanca Estella Vazquez Carrillo
Case DescriptionBlanca Estella Vazquez Carrillo, a resident of the U.S. who had been detained by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records about herself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. ICE provided five responsive pages. Vazquez Carrillo filed an administrative appeal of that decision. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services placed Vazquez Carrillo's request on priority processing because she was facing immediate deportation. However, after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Vazquez Carrillo filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
DefendantUSCIS
DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-151COMPLAINT filed by Blanca Estella VAZQUEZ CARRILLO; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17439339. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-152ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Blanca Estella VAZQUEZ CARRILLO by Christopher Paul Elmore (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-16CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-163MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A joint status report is to be filed by 11/25/2020. Instructions may be found on Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-18SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Return Date: 10/19/2020). (acm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-10-054SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blanca Estella Vazquez Carrillo as to All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-145SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blanca Estella Vazquez Carrillo as to All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons and Corrected Return of Service to ICE - 20-cv-5468, # 2 Exhibit Summons and Corrected Return of Service to USCIS - 20-cv-5468, # 3 Exhibit Certified mail receipts and expenses for serving summons - 20-5468, # 4 Exhibit Delivery Confirmations - 20-5468, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Elmore, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar