Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlianza Nacional de Campesinas et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2020cv08463
Date Filed2020-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Virginia A. Phillips
PlaintiffAlianza Nacional de Campesinas
PlaintiffHispanic Federation
PlaintiffGreenLatinos
PlaintiffLabor Council for Latin American Advancement
Case DescriptionAlianza Nacional de Campersinas, Hispanic Federation, GreenLatinos, and the Labor Council for Latin American Advancement submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning plans to expand the migrant children detention facility in Tornillo, Texas. The requesters also asked for expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told the requesters that since there were 600 requests ahead of theirs processing the request would take some time. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the advocacy groups filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing - Compelling Need, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
DefendantUnited States Customs and Border Protection
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-161COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28105962 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Attorney Mychal Ozaeta added to party Alianza Nacional de Campesinas (pty:pla), Attorney Mychal Ozaeta added to party GreenLatinos (pty:pla), Attorney Mychal Ozaeta added to party Hispanic Federation(pty:pla), Attorney Mychal Ozaeta added to party Labor Council for Latin American Advancement(pty:pla))(Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement. (Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-163Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 filed by Plaintiff Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement. (Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-164NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement, (Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-175NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-176NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-17730 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 as to Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (ghap) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-178NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Melissa Legge on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-249EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa A. Legge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28233383) filed by Plaintiff Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order) (Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-2510STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-2511TEXT ONLY NOTICE RE: Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice 9 . In compliance with Local Rule 5-4.4, counsel shall email the Application in PDF format, and the proposed order in Microsoft Word or PDF Format to the Judge's generic chambers email, no later than September 28, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-2812NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement. correcting EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa A. Legge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 9 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-10-0114ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting 9 Non-Resident Attorney Melissa A Legge EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of ALIANZA NACIONAL DE CAMPESINAS, HISPANIC FEDERATION, GREENLATINOS, and LABOR COUNCIL FOR LATIN AMERICAN ADVANCEMENT, designating Mychal R. Ozaeta as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0213NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Melissa A. Legge to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Document is not an EX PARTE, but an Application. (Thrasher, Lupe) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-0715FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Customs and Border Protection amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, 1 , filed by Plaintiff GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0716Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, 15 filed by Plaintiff Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement. (Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0917Summons Issued 15 as to Defendant United States Customs and Border Protection. (yl) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-1218PROOF OF SERVICE Executed GreenLatinos, Hispanic Federation, Alianza Nacional de Campesinas, Labor Council for Latin American Advancement, upon Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to R. Childress, Title - unknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Eddie L. Anderson - Title, unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Covid-19 DHsmes 25025. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Return Receipts)(Ozaeta, Mychal) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar