Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02602
Date Filed2020-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Commerce and the Department of Agriculture for records concerning the government's reaction to Thailand's announcement that it might ban glyphosate. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from either agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-161COMPLAINT under the Freedom of Information Act against All Defendants Dept of Commerce and Dept of Agriculture ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7597485) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Commerce, # 3 Summons Agriculture, # 4 Summons Atty General, # 5 Summons US Atty, # 6 Declaration Corporate Disclosure Form)(Snape, William) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-16Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (zsb) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (zmd) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-173SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-10-064NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Palomaki on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Palomaki, Ashley) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 10/5/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 10/5/2020 (Palomaki, Ashley) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2020. (Palomaki, Ashley) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/13/2020. (Palomaki, Ashley) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar