Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02616
Date Filed2020-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning a deceased individual named Bella Dodd. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and invoked unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-161COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7601770) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for US Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-162LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-18Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly and Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zmd) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-284NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Leigh Di Liberto on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-10-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/5/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/4/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/28/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/28/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar