Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCatholic Charities Legal Services, Archdiocese of Miami, Inc. v. Director of Office of Information Programs and Services, U.S. Department of State et al
DistrictSouthern District of Florida
CityMiami
Case Number1:2020cv23846
Date Filed2020-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beth Bloom
PlaintiffCatholic Charities Legal Services, Archdiocese of Miami, Inc.
Case DescriptionCatholic Charities Legal Services, Archdiocese of Miami submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the characteristics that make Cuban citizens eligible for repatriation to Cuba. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Catholic Charities Legal Services filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDirector of Office of Information Programs and Services, U.S. Department of State Eric F. Stein
DefendantU.S. Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-161COMPLAINT against Director of Office of Information Programs and Services, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of State. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13535442, filed by Catholic Charities Legal Services, Archdiocese of Miami, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-162Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-173Summons Issued as to Director of Office of Information Programs and Services, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Department of State, U.S Attorney General and U.S. Attorney's Office Southern District of Florida. (scn) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-174ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-10-025SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Catholic Charities Legal Services, Archdiocese of Miami, Inc.. All Plaintiffs. (Montanez, Felix) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-026SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Catholic Charities Legal Services, Archdiocese of Miami, Inc.. Director of Office of Information Programs and Services, U.S. Department of State served on 9/29/2020, answer due 11/30/2020; U.S. Department of State served on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (ls)(See Image at DE #5) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-057Clerks Notice to Filer re 5 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Incorrect Party Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the incorrect parties as being served. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see [de#6]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ls) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar