Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOakes v. United States Department of Defense
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2020cv07591
Date Filed2020-09-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Sidney H. Stein
PlaintiffCameron Oakes
Case DescriptionCameron Oakes, a freelance journalist, submitted five FOIA requests to the Department of Defense for records concerning contracts awarded to several companies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Oakes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-161COMPLAINT against United States Department of Defense. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21687335)Document filed by Cameron Oakes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B to Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C to Complaint, # 4 Exhibit D to Complaint, # 5 Exhibit E to Complaint, # 6 Exhibit F to Complaint).(Nowak, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-162CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Nowak, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-17CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pne) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-17Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pne) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-17Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-173REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Cameron Oakes..(Nowak, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-184ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense..(dnh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-10-215LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Alexander J. Hogan dated October 21, 2020. Document filed by United States Department of Defense..(Hogan, Alexander) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-216ORDER: This case has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. Counsel for all parties are required to register promptly as filing users in accordance with the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. An initial pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is scheduled via teleconference for December 10, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., and as further set forth in this Order. The parties shall dial 888-273-3658 and use access code 7004275 to join the teleconference. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to notify defendant's counsel of this teleconference. Attorneys are directed to consult the Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions and Judge Stein's Individual Rules with respect to procedures for matters assigned to him. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Sidney H. Stein). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/21/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-217ORDER granting 5 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Alexander J. Hogan dated October 21, 2020. Document filed by United States Department of Defense. Defendant's time to answer the complaint is extended to November 20, 2020. So ordered. United States Department of Defense answer due 11/20/2020. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/21/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-11-208ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Department of Defense..(Hogan, Alexander) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar