Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-09-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Public Buildings Reform Board (Receipt # AWAWDC-6601911), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-09-16 | 2 | NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1231-RSL; 2:20-cv-1232-RSL; 2:20-cv-1233-RSL, by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-09-17 | | Judge Richard A. Jones added. (RE) (Entered: 09/17/2020) |
2020-09-17 | 3 | Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Public Buildings Reform Board. (RE) (Entered: 09/17/2020) |
2020-09-18 | | Case reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik as related to 2:20-cv-1231-RSL, 2:20-cv-1232-RSL, and 2:20-cv-1233-RSL. Judge Richard A. Jones no longer assigned to the case. (VE) (Entered: 09/18/2020) |
2020-09-21 | 4 | AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to Public Buildings Reform Board on 9/17/2020 9/21/2020 , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn) Modified on 9/23/2020 (MW). (Entered: 09/21/2020) |
2020-10-16 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board. (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 10/16/2020) |
2020-10-19 | 6 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Public Buildings Reform Board.(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 10/19/2020) |
2020-10-22 | 7 | ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2020, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/22/2020) (KERR). (Entered: 10/22/2020) |
2020-10-27 | 8 | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment of no more than 24 pages by 2/25/2021. Defendant shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment of no more than 36 pages by 3/18/2021. Plaintiffs shall file a combined reply and opposition of no more than 24 pages by 4/5/2021. Defendant shall file a reply of no more than 12 pages by 4/9/2021. (KERR) (Entered: 10/27/2020) |
2020-12-04 | 9 | Unopposed MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Clarification of Case Management Order re 8 Order, , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/4/2020, (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 12/04/2020) |
2020-12-07 | 10 | ORDER granting Plaintiff's 9 Motion for Clarification of Case Management Order. The State of Washington may file a motion for summary judgment prior to the February 25th deadline set forth in the Case Management Order, and that motion may be considered on the noting date as calculated under the Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 12/07/2020) |
2020-12-10 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian J Sutherland on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2020) |
2020-12-10 | 12 | MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/1/2021, (Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2020) |
2020-12-10 | 13 | DECLARATION of Lauryn K. Fraas filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9)(Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 12/10/2020) |
2020-12-28 | 14 | RESPONSE, by Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board, to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 12/28/2020) |
2020-12-28 | 15 | DECLARATION of Adam Bodner filed by Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 12/28/2020) |
2020-12-31 | 16 | REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Sutherland, Brian) (Entered: 12/31/2020) |
2020-12-31 | 17 | DECLARATION of Nathan K. Bays filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Bays, Nathan) (Entered: 12/31/2020) |
2021-01-05 | 18 | ORDER granting Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's request for an award of attorney's fees is premature. Once production occurs and all disputes regarding the scope of the production and any claimed exemptions are resolved, the fee issue may be raised again in a separate motion. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 01/05/2021) |
2021-02-23 | 19 | Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 2/23/2021, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 02/23/2021) |
2021-02-26 | 20 | ORDER re parties' 19 Stipulated Motion. The current dispositive motion deadline is hereby STRICKEN. The parties shall, within 60 days of the date of this order, file a notice of settlement, a status update, and/or a proposed stipulated briefing schedule for the Court's review. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM) (Entered: 02/26/2021) |
2021-04-27 | 21 | Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 4/27/2021, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 04/27/2021) |
2021-04-28 | 22 | STIPULATION AND ORDER re Parties' 21 Stipulated Motion. The parties are to provide this Court with a status update and/or propose a stipulated briefing schedule within 60 days. Should resolution not be possible, the parties reserve their rights to file a motion in advance of 60 days. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 04/28/2021) |
2021-06-28 | 23 | Stipulated MOTION AND STATUS REPORT , filed by Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 6/28/2021, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 06/28/2021) |
2021-06-29 | 24 | ORDER granting Parties' 23 Stipulated Motion and Status Report. The parties are to provide this Court with a status update and/or propose a stipulated briefing schedule within 90 days. Should resolution not be possible, the parties reserve their rights to file a motion in advance of 90 days. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SR) (Entered: 06/29/2021) |
2021-09-27 | 25 | Stipulated MOTION AND STATUS REPORT , filed by Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 9/27/2021, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/27/2021) |
2021-09-28 | 26 | ORDER re Parties' 25 Stipulated Motion. The parties shall jointly provide this Court with a status update and/or propose a stipulated briefing schedule within 60 days. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 09/28/2021) |
2021-11-29 | 27 | Stipulated MOTION AND STATUS REPORT , filed by Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 11/29/2021, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 11/29/2021) |
2021-11-30 | 28 | ORDER re Parties' 27 Stipulated MOTION AND STATUS REPORT . The parties shall either provide this Court with a joint stipulation of dismissal or propose a stipulated briefing schedule within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 11/30/2021) |
2021-12-13 | 29 | Stipulated MOTION for Order of Dismissal with Prejudice , filed by Defendant Public Buildings Reform Board. Noting Date 12/13/2021, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 12/13/2021) |
2021-12-14 | 30 | STIPULATED ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re Parties' 29 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 12/14/2021) |
Hide Docket Events |