Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBONILLA REYES v. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02649
Date Filed2020-09-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUAN JOSE BONILLA REYES
Case DescriptionJuan Jose Bonilla Reyes submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and component agencies for records concerning his border apprehension and any encounters between him and CBP. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Reyes filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL
DefendantCUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL
1300 Pennsylvania Ave NW
Washington, DC 20229
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
500 12th Street SW
Washington, DC 20024
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
20 Massachusetts Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20529
DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
2707 Martin Luther King Jr Ave SE
Washington, DC 20528
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
5107 Leesburg Pike, Suite 2150
Falls Church, VA 22041
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
95 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530
DefendantUS Attorney MICHAEL R. SHERWIN
555 4th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20530
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-181COMPLAINT FOIA against All Defendants CBP et at (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by JUAN JOSE BONILLA REYES. (Attachments: # 1 Appearance of Counsel, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 1, # 4 Exhibit Exh. 2, # 5 Exhibit Exh. 3, # 6 Exhibit Exh. 4, # 7 Summons Proposed summons for CBP, # 8 Summons Proposed summons for ICE, # 9 Summons Proposed summons for USCIS, # 10 Summons Proposed summons DHS, # 11 Summons Proposed summons for EOIR, # 12 Summons Proposed summons for AG, # 13 Summons Proposed summons for US Attorney)(Kramer, Ilana) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-21Payment for 1 Complaint,,. ($400; Receipt number ADCDC-7616769). (Kramer, Ilana) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-23Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-242SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to CUSTOMS AND BORDER PATROL, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-243STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 24, 2020. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar