Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02665
Date Filed2020-09-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Interior for records concerning the withdrawal of a 2014 decision by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to discontinue the use of neonicotinoid pesticides. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CBD filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7614637) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Interior, # 3 Summons US AG, # 4 Summons US Atty DC, # 5 Declaration Corporate Disclosure)(Snape, William) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-22Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zmd) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-222SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-223STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 22, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-234MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lalli Venkatakrishnan, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-7629291. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snape, William) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-24MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lalli Venkatakrishnan, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Lalli Venkatakrishnan is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice . Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). Click for instructions . Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on September 24, 2020. (lccjn2) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-10-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/31/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mail Receipts)(Snape, William) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar