Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02667
Date Filed2020-09-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning emails between the Federal Highway Administration and the District of Columbia's Department of Transportation pertaining to the paining of Black Lives Manner on the pavement on 16th St. NW. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-211COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7616151) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-21Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-304RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/28/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/28/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-305RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/28/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-306RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 9/28/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-267MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Truong, John) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-26MINUTE ORDER: Granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 11/27/2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/26/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/27/2020. (tb) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-198Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-20MINUE ORDER: Granting Consent 8 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 12/11/20. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/20/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-20Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 12/11/20. (jth) (Entered: 11/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar