Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02669
Date Filed2020-09-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Postal Service for records concerning communications to or from Louis DeJoy or his staff pertaining to a list of keywords related to voting by mail. A second request asked for records pertaining to written guidance on voting by mail issues. American Oversight also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency told American Oversight it could find no records pertaining to written guidance. American Oversight filed an administrative appeal of the no records decision. After hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-211COMPLAINT against U.S. POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7617247) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-22Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-243SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-10-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/4/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/29/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE served on 9/29/2020 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-11-045ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE.(Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-05MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by November 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/5/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-186Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Dodge, Christopher) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than December 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/19/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar