Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHARRINGTON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02671
Date Filed2020-09-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffKOHL HARRINGTON
Case DescriptionKohl Harrington, a documentary filmmaker, submitted three FOIA requests for emails from agency employees Brandon Gaylord, Michael Marquis, Kim Hutchinson, Natasha Taylor, Brandon Lancey, or Greg Montross containing Kohl Harrington as the key term. He also submitted a request to the FDA for all records of appeals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7617457) filed by KOHL HARRINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10, # 2 Exhibit 11-20, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-212NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of KOHL HARRINGTON (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-213NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of KOHL HARRINGTON (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-22Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-224SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-10-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 10/1/2020 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/1/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/2/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/1/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-11-028ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-02VACATED as per minute order dated 11/16/2020............MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before November 16, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/2/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/16/2020. (tj) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-169Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Court's minute order dated November 2, 2020, is VACATED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 16, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/16/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/16/2020. (tj) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar