Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSANDS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02679
Date Filed2020-09-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJESTAN SANDS
Case DescriptionJestan Sands, a citizen of the Bahamas, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning Sands' status as a cooperator with the office of Homeland Security Investigations and information he provided about Peter Nygaard. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Sands filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantHOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-211COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7618587) filed by JESTAN SANDS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Bensky, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-09-232ERRATA by JESTAN SANDS 1 Complaint filed by JESTAN SANDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bensky, Eric) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-23Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zsb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-24SUMMONS Not Issued as to HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (adh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-243REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Department of Homeland Security, Homeland Security Investigation, and U.S. Immigration & Customs Enforcement re 1 Complaint filed by JESTAN SANDS. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by JESTAN SANDS.(Bensky, Eric) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-254SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-10-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/22/20. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bensky, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-266RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 10/5/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bensky, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-267RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/5/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bensky, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-268RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS served on 10/5/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bensky, Eric) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-11-049ANSWER to Complaint by HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by November 19, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/05/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/19/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-1910Joint STATUS REPORT by HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-20MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by December 18, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/20/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2020. (znbn) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar