Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION et al v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02689
Date Filed2020-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION
PlaintiffCENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Frontier Foundation and the Center for Democracy and Technology submitted FOIA requests to OMB and the Department of Justice for records concerning the implementation of the May 2020 Executive Order on Preventing Online Censorship. EFF and CDT also asked for expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, EFF and CDT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-221COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7621918) filed by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Office of Management and Budget, # 3 Summons Department of Justice, # 4 Summons US Attorney General, # 5 Summons US Attorney General, District of Columbia)(Sobel, David) Modified filer on 9/25/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-222LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of Electronic Frontier Foundation by ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION (Sobel, David) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-223LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests of Center for Democracy & Technology by CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY (Sobel, David) Modified filer on 9/25/2020 (znmw). (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zsb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-244SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-10-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/1/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/31/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/1/2020; OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 10/5/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/01/2020. (View Docket Entry 5 to view document). (eg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-197NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of All Defendants (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar