Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHOHNER v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02691
Date Filed2020-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffEDWARD DEAN HOHNER
Case DescriptionEdward Dean Hohner, who had been convicted of a drug-related murder in California, submitted FOIA requests to the Drug Enforcement Administration and the FBI for records concerning his investigation and conviction. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after the agencies failed to respond, Hohner filed suit in the Central District of California. His case was then transferred to the District Court for the District of Columbia.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Matthew Jimenez Barragan
300 North Los Angeles Street
Suite 7516
Los Angele, CA 90012
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-06-12LODGED COMPLAINT sought to be filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-121NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Upon submission of your complaint it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action will be dismissed and the file closed. If you submit the CV-60P form or pay the filing fee within THIRTY DAYS, your case will be filed. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (Attachments: # 1 CV-60P) (lh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: # 2 Lodged Complaint) (lh). [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-07-082FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 filing fee from Edward Dean Hohner. Re: Notice Re: Discrepancies with Lodging of Complaint (CV-47P),,, 1 . Receipt number LA191582. (ek) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 07/08/2019)
2019-07-093COMPLAINT against Defendants U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service.Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver.(Filing fee $ 400 Paid), filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-094NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-095NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-096STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-107ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-02669 GW(PLAx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-05100 GW(PLAx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-178Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 07/17/2019)
2019-10-15960 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), 3 as to defendants U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2020-04-2210MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu. (Show Cause Response due by 5/15/2020.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 04/22/2020)
2020-05-0611RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 10 filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-1312ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Defendants U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-1413MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has received Plaintiff's Response to the Order to Show Cause (see, Docket No. 11). Plaintiff is advised that an Alias Summons was issued by the Clerk's Office on May 13, 2020 (see, Docket No. 12). A copy is attached. The order to show cause issued on April 22, 2020 is DISCHARGED. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-2814PROOF OF SERVICE BY US MAIL ON 5/22/20 Executed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner, upon Defendant U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020; U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020; U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-2215PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner, upon Defendant U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020; U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020; U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020 and includes service on Civil Process Clerk, Office of US Attorney on 6/15/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified.. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached (see document for registered or certified receipt numbers only ). Original Summons returned. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-08-1216NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Columbia ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service(pty:dft)) (Barragan, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-1317PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants U.S. Department of Justice Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice U.S. Immigration and Customs Service, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Columbia ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 16 served on 8/12/2020. (Barragan, Matthew) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-08-1318TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a hearing on DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE 16 for 9/14/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-09-0919RESPONSE TO: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE: AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT DUE TO DEFENDANTS NOT RESPONDING TO SUMMONS WITHIN 60 DAYS 16 filed by Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-1420MINUTES OF OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE 16 Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: Plaintiff Edward Dean Hohner, pro se, is in state custody and not present. Court confers with government counsel. The Tentative circulated and attached, is adopted as the Courts Final Ruling. Defendants Motion is GRANTED. The Court would GRANT Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue and order the Clerk of the Court to transfer this case to the United States District Courtfor the District of Columbia. Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (Entire Case Electronically sent to USDC District of Columbia on 9/15/2020). Court Reporter: Terri A. Hourigan. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 9/15/2020 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 9/22/2020.] (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-2221Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-05100. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/22/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar