Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Cincinnati Enquirer v. Department of Justice et al
DistrictSouthern District of Ohio
CityCincinnati
Case Number1:2020cv00758
Date Filed2020-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Susan J. Dlott
PlaintiffThe Cincinnati Enquirer A division of Gannett GP Media, Inc.
Case DescriptionJulia Fair, a reporter for the Cincinnati Enquirer, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning the handling of allegations of drug use by Ryan Jacobs, a Kentucky Commonwealth Attorney, by the DEA and the Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency then issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records, citing Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The Cincinnati Enquirer filed an administrative appeal of the denial but after hearing anything further from the agency, the Cincinnati Enquirer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantDrug Enforcement Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-221COMPLAINT against United States Department of Justice, United States Drug Enforcement Administration ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7668070), filed by The Cincinnati Enquirer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Request, # 2 Exhibit B Denial, # 3 Exhibit C Appeal, # 4 Exhibit D DOJ Affirmation, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Form to U.S. Dept of Justice, # 7 Summons Form to U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration) (Greiner, John) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-222Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs The Cincinnati Enquirer, Gannett GP Media, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gannett GP Media, Inc. for The Cincinnati Enquirer.. (Greiner, John) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-22If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (bjc) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-223NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Matthew Schultz for Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer (Schultz, Frank) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-234NOTICE of Appearance by Darren William Ford for Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer (Ford, Darren) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-235[FORMER DOC.5 - PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR.] Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration. (kl) Modified docket text and document security on 9/23/2020 (kl). (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-236Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-23Notice of Correction : Please disregard, [FORMER DOC.5] - Incomplete PDF attached. See Doc. 6 for correction. (kl) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-247CERTIFICATE of Mailing: Certified mailing of Summons and Complaint through the Clerk's Office pursuant to Local Rule 4.2. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipts) (kh) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-298NOTICE of Appearance by William Bryan King, II for Defendants Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration (King, William) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-10-019SUMMONS Returned Executed (Not Effectuated related to COVID19) as to Defendants Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration (Civil Process Clerk and U.S. Attorney's Office - Southern District of Ohio). (bjc) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-0610SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Drug Enforcement Administration. (bjc) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-0711NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Judge Susan J. Dlott. (vp) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-1412SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration. Department of Justice served on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020; Drug Enforcement Administration served on 10/2/2020, answer due 12/1/2020 (United States Attorney General and United States Department of Justice). (bjc) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar