Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleALLIANCE FOR AMERICAN MANUFACTURING v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02716
Date Filed2020-09-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffALLIANCE FOR AMERICAN MANUFACTURING
Case DescriptionThe Alliance for American Manufacturing submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Transportation for records concerning a contracted entitled Use of Steel and Iron Materials in Highway Construction. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further, AAM filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7627656) filed by ALLIANCE FOR AMERICAN MANUFACTURING. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- FOIA request to DOT dated 01/13/2020, # 2 Exhibit 2- FedEx Delivery statement dated 01/14/2020, # 3 Exhibit 3- Email dated 01/16/2020, # 4 Exhibit 4- Email dated 02/11/2020, # 5 Exhibit 5- Email dated 02/12/2020 re: confirming receipt of 02/11/2020 email, # 6 Exhibit 6- Fee Estimate for AAM's 01/13/2020 FOIA request, # 7 Exhibit 7- Email dated 02/13/2020, # 8 Exhibit 8- Email Correspondences, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons)(Stern, Bezalel) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-23Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-242SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar