Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSchlumberger Technology Coporation v. United States Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration
DistrictSouthern District of Texas
CityGalveston
Case Number3:2020cv00295
Date Filed2020-09-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jeffrey V Brown
PlaintiffSchlumberger Technology Coporation
Case DescriptionSchlumberger Technology Corporation submitted a FOIA request to the Occupational Safety and Health Administration for records concerning the agency's investigation of a workplace accident at a facility in Galveston, particularly witness statements made by three employees. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and assessed Schlumberger Technology $50 for processing the request. The agency disclosed 136 pages withholding portions under Exemption 5 (privileges), Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records), and Exemption 7(D) (confidential sources). Schlumberger Technology filed an administrative appeal of the denial. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Schlumberger Technology Corporation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-231COMPLAINT against United States Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25246182) filed by Schlumberger Technology Coporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scofield, Denise) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-232Request for Issuance of Summons as to United States Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration, c/o United States Attorneys Office; Attorney General of the United States; and Office of the Solicitor of Labor, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Scofield, Denise) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-233NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Duke on behalf of Schlumberger Technology Coporation, filed. (Duke, Brandon) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-244Summons Issued as to United States Department of Labor, Occupational Safety and Health Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-245ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-10-086CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Schlumberger Technology Coporation, filed.(Scofield, Denise) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar