Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSea Shepherd Legal v. National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration et al
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2020cv01412
Date Filed2020-09-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James L. Robart
PlaintiffSea Shepherd Legal
Case DescriptionSea Shepherd Legal submitted a FOIA request to the National Marine Fisheries Service for records concerning the New Zealand Maui dolphin. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Sea Shepherd Legal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration an agency of the United States
DefendantNational Marine Fisheries Service an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Opinion/Order [17]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-231COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # AWAWDC-6617474), filed by Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Sommermeyer, Brett) Modified on 9/24/2020 to edit document title. (RE) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-232NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-463; 2:19-cv-01485, by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-233CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-234EXHIBIT A re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-235EXHIBIT B re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-236EXHIBIT C re 1 Complaint by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-24U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour added. (RE) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-247Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (Attachments: # 1 Summons-US Attorney, # 2 Summons-National Oceanic, # 3 Summons- Attorney General)(RE) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-29Case Reassigned to Judge James L. Robart. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-10-058AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, filed by Sea Shepherd Legal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-289AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to National Marine Fisheries Service on 9/29/2020, filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-2810AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to National Oceanic Atmospheric Administration on 9/29/2020, filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-2811AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to United States Attorney General on 9/29/2020, filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-10-2812AFFIDAVIT of Mailing of Summons and Complaint to U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Washington on 9/29/2020, filed by Plaintiff Sea Shepherd Legal. (Sommermeyer, Brett) (Entered: 10/28/2020)
2020-11-0213NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michelle R. Lambert on behalf of Defendants National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-0214ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint, by National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration.(Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-1215ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 11/27/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/10/2020. (AD) (Entered: 11/12/2020)
2020-11-2316Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order for Relief From 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report , filed by Defendants National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration. Noting Date 11/23/2020, (Lambert, Michelle) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar