Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02727
Date Filed2020-09-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications that former Justice Anthony Kennedy had with the Trump administration and any preferences Kennedy expressed for who should replace him. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-241COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7635181) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-25Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-10-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/29/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/29/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/29/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/29/2020 (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-295NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-10-296ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 10/29/2020)
2020-11-02MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by November 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/2/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule or Disclosure due by 11/16/2020. (zkh) (Entered: 11/03/2020)
2020-11-167Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report, including, if necessary, a proposed briefing schedule, no later than January 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/17/20. (lctjk2) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/15/2021. (zkh) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar